OR HB2436 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Chapter 8, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Chapter 8, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies provisions of energy efficiency and sustainable technology loan program.
Title
Relating to energy efficiency and sustainable technology loan program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | Chapter 8, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--George. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Vega Pederson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading. |
2013-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |