OR HB2427 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Housing and Community Services Department to establish and maintain uniform rental application system. Directs Housing and Community Services Department to establish and maintain uniform rental application system. Requires landlords to accept uniform rental application submitted with uniform tenant screening report. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to rental applications; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2427 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2427/Introduced |