OR HB2420 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 246, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 13, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 246, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 13, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority to designate work group to propose options for equitable access to birth and death certificates throughout state and equitable fee revenue to maintain and improve vital records system. Directs Oregon Health Authority to adopt rules allowing county registrar to issue and sell records of live births and deaths occurring in any county of state.] Directs Oregon Health Authority to designate work group to propose options for equitable access to birth and death certificates throughout state and equitable fee revenue to maintain and improve vital records system. Requires authority to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to vital records no later than January 1, 2025. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to vital records; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-24 | House | Chapter 246, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 13, 2023. |
2023-07-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Owens. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 5--Breese-Iverson, Diehl, Goodwin, Javadi, Mannix; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fahey, Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading. |
2023-03-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |