OR HB2388 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 73, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 73, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Department of Consumer and Business Services to deny, revoke or suspend registration of pharmacy benefit manager if pharmacy benefit manager engages in specified conduct. Authorizes department to adopt fee structure for registration. Protects from disclosure documents obtained by department during denial, suspension or revocation of pharmacy benefit manager registration. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to pharmacy benefit managers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Chapter 73, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 17, 2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Boone, Clem, Gorsek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Keny-Guyer. |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |