OR HB2385 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Revenue to develop, implement and maintain software system that enables online filing and processing of returns and database of information entered in software system. Directs Department of Revenue to develop, implement and maintain software system that enables online filing and processing of returns and database of information entered in software system. Provides that use of software system shall be mandatory. Authorizes department to use database to produce anonymized reports. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the development of an online software system for property tax returns; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2385 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2385/Introduced |