OR HB2372 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates landlord's ability to terminate residential tenancy without cause. Eliminates landlord's ability to terminate residential tenancy without cause. Clarifies damages available to tenant for landlord's unlawful no-cause notice or fraudulent landlord-cause notice.
Title
Relating to terminations of residential tenancies without tenant cause.
Sponsors
Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2372 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2372/Introduced |