OR HB2341 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 198, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 198, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes court to order defendant to pay extradition costs when defendant is found in violation of probation in certain circumstances. Authorizes court to order defendant to pay extradition costs when defendant is found in violation of probation in certain circumstances. Directs moneys collected for extradition costs after conviction or probation violation proceeding to be deposited in Arrest and Return Account.
Title
Relating to extradition costs.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Chapter 198, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-06-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Carried over to 05-20 by unanimous consent. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2015-04-07 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-04 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |