OR HB2337 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Foster Parent Ombudsman in Department of Human Services and prescribes duties. Establishes Foster Parent Ombudsman Advisory Committee to monitor ombudsman, advise Governor and Legislative Assembly on ombudsman and nominate individuals to serve as ombudsman if vacancy occurs. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to foster parents; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] |
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2337 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2337/Introduced |