OR HB2336 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Chapter 32, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Chapter 32, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removing population requirement for affordable housing pilot program if no qualifying nomination is received for city with population under 25,000.
Title
Relating to affordable housing pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Chapter 32, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Hansell, Johnson, Steiner Hayward, Winters. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Housing. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Zika. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Doherty, Hayden, Hernandez, McLain, Nearman. |
2019-02-26 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-02-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |