OR HB2334 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Chapter 45, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 05, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Chapter 45, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 05, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires affidavit alleging undue hardship to be filed within 30 days after entry of order specially designating complaint for hearing in regular division of Oregon Tax Court. Provides for dismissal of complaint for failure to pay tax, penalty and interest unless plaintiff files affidavit alleging undue hardship. Applies to complaints filed on or after effective date of Act. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to affidavits alleging undue hardship filed in Oregon Tax Court; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Chapter 45, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 05, 2015. |
2015-04-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-03-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Vega Pederson. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--McLane; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fagan, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-03-26 | House | Second reading. |
2015-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-03-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-02-16 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |