OR HB2331 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Water Resources Commission has certain amount of time to enforce general or special standards related to well construction activities. Establishes Task Force on Oregon Well Construction Enforcement Activities. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to enforcement time limits for well construction activities; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |