OR HB2330 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Growth Board to establish board and implement policies, procedures and recommendations for investment, reinvestment, management and coordination of funds in Oregon Growth Account and Oregon Growth Fund.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Growth Board; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |