OR HB2327 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Chapter 14, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Chapter 14, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes guidance statement and framework of healthy streams partnership from description of Oregon Plan. Expands Oregon Watershed Enhancement Board to include representative of United States Fish and Wildlife Service as nonvoting member. Revises language regarding applicant revision and resubmission of proposal board has rejected for funding. Requires all local watershed councils to periodically report to county governing body. Eliminates Oregon Department of Administrative Services authority to pay liability insurance costs for local watershed councils. Requires recipients of grants from Oregon Watershed Enhancement Board to maintain liability insurance for actions in connection with grant. Eliminates requirement that watershed enhancement program conducted by board include coordination of certain geographic information. Revises program duties of board. Eliminates requirement that board biennial report to Governor and Legislative Assembly include status report on drainage basin watershed and key habitat conditions. Revises requirement that natural resources agencies provide board with information for report. Changes reporting cycle for biennial report. Eliminates requirement that certain state agencies provide board with copies of agency reports pertaining to riparian areas and associated uplands.
Title
Relating to administration of the Oregon Plan.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Chapter 14, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-04-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-03-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, DeBoer, Thatcher. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, Gorsek. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-02-23 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-02-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-02 | House | Public Hearing scheduled. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |