OR HB2327 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Chapter 6, (2015 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Chapter 6, (2015 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies statutes relating to custodianship of practice of nonperforming attorney. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to custodianship of practice of nonperforming attorney; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Chapter 6, (2015 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2015. |
2015-03-12 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Carried over to 03-04 by unanimous consent. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-02-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barton. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Clem, Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley. |
2015-02-09 | House | Second reading. |
2015-02-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |