OR HB2319 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows State Department of Agriculture to impose appropriate precautions and safeguards on growing of agricultural and horticultural commodities to prevent spreading of genetically engineered material to nearby property used for farming practices.
Title
Relating to commodities containing genetically engineered material.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-04 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2013-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |