OR HB2315 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Legislative Assembly to appropriate amount equal to one percent of total amount of General Fund appropriations and lottery allocations for next biennium to both Oregon Rainy Day Fund and Education Stability Fund if state unemployment rate for previous year is six percent or less at time of last economic and revenue forecast of biennium.
Title
Relating to state finance.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Barton [D] | Rep. Jules Kopel-Bailey [D] | Sen. Shemia Fagan [D] | Rep. Tobias Read [D] |
Rep. Dennis Richardson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-05-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |