OR HB2301 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 649, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 649, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public online education; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to public online education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 649, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-28 | President signed. | |
2011-06-28 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-21 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Kruse. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed. Ayes, 17; nays, 12--Bonamici, Burdick, Devlin, Dingfelder, Edwards, Hass, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Rosenbaum, Shields, Verger; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2011-06-21 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Recommendation: Without recommendation, returning to President. Referred to third reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-21 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-21 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Wingard. | |
2011-06-21 | Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 27--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Beyer, Buckley, Cannon, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Frederick, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Hunt, Jenson, Kotek, Matthews, Nathanson, Nolan, Read, Schaufler, Smith G., Smith J., Tomei, Witt. | |
2011-06-21 | Motion to postpone indefinitely failed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 38--Bailey, Bentz, Berger, Boone, Brewer, Cameron, Clem, Conger, Cowan, Doherty, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Garrett, Gilliam, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Komp, Kotek, Krieger, Lindsay, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sheehan, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Wand, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard, Speaker Hanna, Speaker Roblan. | |
2011-06-21 | Vote reconsideration carried. Ayes, 33; Nays, 27--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Beyer, Buckley, Cannon, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Frederick, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Hunt, Komp, Kotek, Matthews, Nathanson, Nolan, Read, Schaufler, Smith J., Tomei, Witt, Speaker Roblan. | |
2011-06-20 | Clem served notice of possible reconsideration. | |
2011-06-20 | Cameron changed vote from "aye" to "nay" and served notice of possible reconsideration. | |
2011-06-20 | Smith J. served notice of possible reconsideration. | |
2011-06-20 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Wingard. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Failed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 31--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Beyer, Buckley, Cameron, Cannon, Clem, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Frederick, Garrett, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Hunt, Jenson, Kotek, Matthews, Nathanson, Nolan, Read, Schaufler, Smith G., Smith J., Tomei, Witt, Speaker Roblan. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 20, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-06-20 | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-17 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-17 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-17 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-16 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-06-15 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-06-15 | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-06-10 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-25 | Referred to Rules by order of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-04-25 | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-20 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-14 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-11 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |