OR HB2291 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Referred to Energy and Environment.
Pending: House Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Public Utility Commission to identify and compile projected percentages of electricity sold by each electric company to retail electricity consumers in 2025, 2030 and 2035 that will be qualifying electricity, and provide information in report to appropriate interim committees of the Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2021. Requires Public Utility Commission to identify and compile projected percentages of electricity sold by each electric company to retail electricity consumers in 2025, 2030 and 2035 that will be qualifying electricity, and provide information in report to appropriate interim committees of the Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2021. Sunsets January 2, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to renewable portfolio standards; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback