OR HB2290 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusts certain fees imposed by Department of Transportation. Reorganizes laws related to motor vehicle registration, titling, driving privileges and vehicle business certificates. Directs Department of Transportation, once every two years, to conduct study on driver and motor vehicle services costs or examination of data collected since previous study. Requires department to report on study or examination each odd-numbered year to legislative committees with primary responsibility for transportation. Becomes operative July 1, 2018.
Title
Relating to fees imposed by the Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |