OR HB2289 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Oregon State Capitol Foundation to undertake fund-raising and commissioning of statue of Mark Odom Hatfield, to be placed in National Statuary Hall in United States Capitol.
Title
Relating to placement of statues in National Statuary Hall; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tobias Read [D] | Rep. Vic Gilliam [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |