OR HB2286 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to high school students; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to high school students; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-04-21 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-21 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |