OR HB2285 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies limit on issuance of infrastructure lottery bonds.
Title
Relating to infrastructure.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules by prior reference, and then be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-24 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |