OR HB2283 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Chapter 286, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Chapter 286, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to high school completion; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to high school completion; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Chapter 286, (2011 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2011. | |
2011-06-09 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-03 | President signed. | |
2011-06-02 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-25 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Esquivel. | |
2011-05-23 | Third reading. Carried by Morse. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Boquist, Monnes Anderson. | |
2011-05-19 | Carried over to 05-23 by unanimous consent. | |
2011-05-18 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-17 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2011-05-12 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-10 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-28 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. | |
2011-03-03 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-03-02 | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Brewer. | |
2011-03-01 | Second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-02-23 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-14 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Education. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |