OR HB2274 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Chapter 472, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Chapter 472, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certified peace officers.
Title
Relating to certified peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Chapter 472, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-06-23 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-20 | President signed. | |
2011-06-17 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-14 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hunt. | |
2011-06-10 | Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Bates, Telfer, Verger. | |
2011-06-09 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2011-06-01 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-05-26 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-03-23 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-03-21 | Third reading. Carried by Garrard. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Berger, Clem, Weidner. | |
2011-03-17 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-15 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-03-09 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-23 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |