OR HB2245 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases, for purposes of tax credit allowed for crop donation, percentage of wholesale price allowed as amount of credit. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2015. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits for crop donation; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-12 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 26 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-12 | House | Motion to withdraw from Agriculture and Natural Resources failed.Ayes, 26; Nays, 31--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Doherty, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, Nathanson, Nosse, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 3--Barreto, Esquivel, Johnson. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |