OR HB2228 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Local Government Technical Assistance Program within Housing and Community Services Department. Requires program to provide assistance to] department and Department of Land Conservation and Development to enter into intergovernmental agreement with League of Oregon Cities and Association of Oregon Counties to develop regional housing and development staff] work plans to assist cities and counties] local governments in providing needed housing. Appropriates funds for program to department] Housing and Community Services Department. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to housing technical assistance for local governments; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |