OR HB2222 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Land Conservation and Development Commission to study potential conversion to regional land use planning process. Requires commission to report to interim legislative committee related to land use by January 15, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to regional land use planning; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Knute Buehler [R] | Rep. Gregory Barreto [R] |
Rep. Mike Nearman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2222 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2222/Introduced |