OR HB2219 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 195, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Chapter 195, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to convene work group to study consolidation of application processes for human and social services and to report recommendation to Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the consolidation of application processes for statewide social services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Chapter 195, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015. |
2015-06-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Carried over to 05-20 by unanimous consent. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2015-04-07 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-06 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2015-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2015-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |