OR HB2204 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalty for unlawful manufacture of hydrocodone.
Title
Relating to controlled substances; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |