OR HB2195 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Dedicates portion of State Capitol State Park to Vietnam War memorial. Exempts memorial from certain land use laws. Establishes Vietnam War Memorial Task Force to arrange for development, design and construction of memorial to honor Oregon's Vietnam War veterans. Directs task force to apply for specified grants to aid in memorial development. Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to maintain finished memorial. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to a memorial to Oregon's Vietnam War veterans; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |