OR HB2177 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Business Development Department to study and make recommendations regarding state laws governing ports. Requires department to submit report on findings by January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to ports.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Economic Development.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback