OR HB2176 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 204, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 204, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes moneys in Mental Health Alcoholism and Drug Services Account to be used by counties to provide funding to sobering facilities. Exempts sobering facilities receiving moneys from account from requirements to report data to Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission.
Title
Relating to sobering facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 204, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |