OR HB2172 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 450, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 450, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands eligibility for earned reduction in supervision to include persons on any type of supervision who are not serving sentence for disqualifying crime. Expands eligibility for earned reduction in supervision to include persons on any type of supervision who are not serving sentence for disqualifying crime. Specifies that rules adopted by Department of Corrections to carry out program must include notification of eligibility and standards for determining when person has earned reduction.
Title
Relating to sentencing.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 450, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 31; Nays, 28--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Clem, Drazan, Evans, Gomberg, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Lively, Moore-Green, Morgan, Neron, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Witt, Wright, Zika. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard, Prozanski. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Heard, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng bill. (Minority) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) not concurring. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 8--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Cate, Drazan, Evans, Hayden, Post, Smith G; Excused, 3--Clem, Leif, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Prusak. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |