OR HB2165 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For purposes of corporate excise tax, includes corporation incorporated in United States or foreign country in determination of unitary relationship among corporations. Requires corporation filing corporate excise tax return to file annual report with Department of Revenue listing jurisdictions in which corporation, subsidiaries or parent corporation does business, and indicating amount of taxable income reported to each jurisdiction during tax year. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to taxation of multinational corporations; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2165 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2165/Introduced |