OR HB2135 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits pretrial release of defendants charged with felony or Class A misdemeanor to security release. Limits pretrial release of defendants charged with felony or Class A misdemeanor to security release. Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to reimburse counties for costs of pretrial incarceration of persons charged with felonies. Appropriates moneys to department for reimbursement.
Title
Relating to pretrial incarceration.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Mannix [R] | Rep. Court Boice [R] | Rep. Shelly Boshart Davis [R] | Rep. Jami Cate [R] |
Rep. Tracy Cramer [R] | Rep. Ed Diehl [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Cyrus Javadi [R] |
Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Rep. Emily McIntire [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Rep. Brian Stout [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-17 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-06-07 | House | Motion to withdraw from Judiciary failed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 30--Andersen, Bowman, Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Fahey, Gamba, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield; Excused, 1--Levy B. |
2023-05-17 | House | Motion to withdraw from Judiciary failed. Ayes, 30; Nays, 30--Andersen, Bowman, Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Fahey, Gamba, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |