OR HB2130 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter 310, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 05, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter 310, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 05, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes governing bodies to adopt reasonable maximum periods for holding property for development as low income rental housing, additional criteria for exemption of low income rental housing and additional provisions of low income rental housing program that do not conflict with statutory criteria . Authorizes governing bodies to adopt reasonable maximum periods for holding property for development as low income rental housing, additional criteria for exemption of low income rental housing and additional provisions of low income rental housing program that do not conflict with statutory criteria and additional provisions of program applicable to all low income housing property and all taxing districts within jurisdiction of governing body]. Removes outdated connection to Internal Revenue Code. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to exemptions for low income housing; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | House | Chapter 310, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 05, 2015. |
2015-06-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Johnson, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Girod, Thatcher; excused, 2--Beyer, Olsen. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-05-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 49; Nays, 5--Barreto, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Weidner; Excused, 3--Gorsek, Keny-Guyer, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Buckley, Williamson, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-05-11 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |