OR HB2127 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires contracting agency to base determination of contractor's responsibility for public improvement contract on contractor's demonstration that contractor provided health insurance to contractor's employees for period of two years before contractor submitted bid for public improvement contract.
Title
Relating to determinations of responsibility for contractors on public improvement contracts; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |