OR HB2127 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Chapter 50, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Chapter 50, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to habitat conservation stamps.
Title
Relating to habitat conservation stamps.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Chapter 50, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-05-16 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-10 | President signed. | |
2011-05-10 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-05 | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2011-05-04 | Carried over to 05-05 by unanimous consent. | |
2011-05-03 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-03 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-04-28 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. | |
2011-03-14 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-03-10 | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Freeman; Excused, 1--Gelser. | |
2011-03-09 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-04 | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-03-04 | Recommendation: Do pass, rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means, and be placed on Consent Calendar. | |
2011-02-25 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-16 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-02-11 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |