OR HB2126 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Legislative Revenue Officer to report to Legislative Assembly on options for tax reform including recommendations for legislation intended to reform current tax system. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to state finance; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Tax Expenditures (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker. |
2019-05-31 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2019-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |