OR HB2112 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 392, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 392, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts county with population of 650,000 or more from paying city within county 40 percent of moneys generated from vehicle registration fees imposed under county ordinance if moneys are used for certain purposes. Requires Department of Transportation to study development of uniform standards for speed bump height and markings.] Sunsets January 2, 2022.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to transportation; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 392, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Girod, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Hansell, Johnson. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, Leif. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |