OR HB2087 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Chapter 7, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Chapter 7, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes caps on civil penalties that Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services may impose for violations of certain workers' compensation statutes or required practices.
Title
Relating to civil penalties for violations of workers' compensation requirements.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Chapter 7, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-03-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2019-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 26, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-02-21 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |