OR HB2079 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 431, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 431, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and adds laws related to boating offenses. Modifies provisions requiring person to be informed about rights and consequences relating to boating under influence of intoxicants.
Title
Relating to boating offenses.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 431, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Linthicum; Excused, 3--Hansell, Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Carried over to 06-04 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Nathanson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |