OR HB2064 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 110, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 110, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies quorum requirement for Energy Facility Siting Council. Modifies quorum requirement for Energy Facility Siting Council. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a quorum of the Energy Facility Siting Council; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 110, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Anderson, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 16--Boshart Davis, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 5--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Leif, Levy, Nearman. |
2021-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |