OR HB2059 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Chapter 188, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Chapter 188, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to receipt of moneys on behalf of ward in custody of Department of Human Services.
Title
Relating to receipt of moneys on behalf of ward in custody of Department of Human Services.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Chapter 188, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-06-01 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-25 | President signed. | |
2011-05-24 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-17 | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Girod; excused, 2--Bates, Johnson. | |
2011-05-16 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-16 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-05-11 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2011-04-21 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-20 | Third reading. Carried by Weidner. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 3--Kennemer, Smith G., Wand. | |
2011-04-19 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-18 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-04-13 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-11 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-04 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Human Services. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |