OR HB2058 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 813, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 813, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends to June 30, 2017, sunset on lobbyist exemption from reporting to Oregon Government Ethics Commission moneys spent on lobbying other registered lobbyists. Removes] Extends to June 30, 2017, sunset on lobbyist exemption from reporting to Oregon Government Ethics Commission moneys spent on lobbying other registered lobbyists. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to lobbyist reporting requirements; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | House | Chapter 813, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015. |
2015-08-12 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Hansell, granted unanimous consent to change vote to nay. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed.Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Barton, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Evans, Fagan, Gallegos, Gorsek, Johnson, McLain, McLane, Parrish, Piluso, Sprenger, Weidner, Witt; Excused, 1--Smith; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2015-06-22 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-06-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-10 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2015-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |