OR HB2028 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 150, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 150, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eases process for city to elect to receive state-shared revenues. Eases process for city to elect to receive state-shared revenues. Eliminates withholding of 10 percent of state-shared revenues from municipal corporation that has not filed annual audit report.].
Title
Relating to municipal corporation finances.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 150, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 5--Anderson, Findley, Hansell, President Courtney, Thatcher. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 47; Excused, 11--Alonso Leon, Clem, Dexter, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Nearman, Ruiz, Smith G, Wallan, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Marsh, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |