OR HB2015 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases maximum percentage of tax that governing body of city or county may impose on sale of marijuana items. Increases maximum percentage of tax that governing body of city or county may impose on sale of marijuana items. Applies to marijuana items sold on or after January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to local marijuana taxes; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2015 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2015/Introduced |