OR HB2009 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 106, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 01, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 106, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 01, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes temporary limitations on lenders' remedies for borrowers' failures to make payments on obligations secured by mortgages, trust deeds or land sale contracts for certain real property. Establishes temporary limitations on lenders' remedies for borrowers' failures to make payments on obligations secured by mortgages, trust deeds or land sale contracts for certain real property. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to strategies to protect Oregonians from the effects of the COVID-19 pandemic; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 106, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 01, 2021. |
2021-06-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 36; Nays, 20--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 4--Evans, Helm, Sanchez, Smith G. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Anderson, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem. |
2021-04-06 | House | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 35--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Wilde, Williams, Witt; Absent, 1--Reardon; Excused, 1--Clem. |
2021-04-05 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |