OK SJR68 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; repealing sections in Article XXVIII; enacting new sections in Article XXVIIIA; providing for regulation of alcoholic beverages. Ballot title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; repealing sections in Article XXVIII; enacting new sections in Article XXVIIIA; providing for regulation of alcoholic beverages. Ballot title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-26 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: SUSPEND JOINT RULES (Y: 18 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 48 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-27SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2016-05-27HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-05-27SenateEnrolled, to House
2016-05-27SenateReferred for enrollment
2016-05-27HouseTo Senate
2016-05-27HouseMotion expired
2016-05-26HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Mulready
2016-05-26HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 30
2016-05-26HouseCCR adopted
2016-05-23HouseCCR submitted
2016-05-23SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14
2016-05-23SenateCCR adopted
2016-05-19SenateTitle restored
2016-05-18SenateCCR read
2016-05-12HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2016-04-27SenateSCs named Jolley, Justice, Bice, Holt, Bass, Bingman, Floyd
2016-04-26SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2016-04-25SenateHAs read
2016-04-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-04-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-04-21HouseMotion expired
2016-04-21HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Mulready
2016-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 30
2016-04-21HouseTitle stricken
2016-04-21HouseAmended
2016-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2016-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2016-03-09HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2016-03-02HouseFirst Reading
2016-03-02SenateEngrossed to House
2016-03-01SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-03-01SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 16
2016-03-01SenateTitle restored
2016-03-01SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2016-02-29Senatecoauthored by Mulready (principal House author)
2016-02-17SenateTitle stricken
2016-02-17SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2016-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2016-02-01Senatecoauthored by Bingman, Bice
2016-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Jolley
2016-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
ART 281ARepealed CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sjr68&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SRES/SJR68%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SJR68%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SJR68%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SRES/SJR68%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SJR68%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SJR68%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SRES/SJR68%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SJR68_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SJR68_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback