OK SJR66 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - remove as principal author Representative Hall and substitute with Representative Murphey
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - remove as principal author Representative Hall and substitute with Representative Murphey
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; providing for appointment of Insurance Commissioner. Ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; providing for appointment of Insurance Commissioner. Ballot title.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Hall and substitute with Representative Murphey |
2016-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Hall (principal House author) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |